372 | Extension of additional charge of the post of Director Planning, BBNL | Download (473.27 KB) | 24.05.2021 |
371 | Extension of additional charge of the post of Director, Operation, BBNL | Download (473.69 KB) | 24.05.2021 |
370 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director, Finance, BBNL to Shri Awadhesh Kumar, CGM, BBNL | Download (381.82 KB) | 17.05.2021 |
369 | Additional charge of Director, Planning, BBNL to Shri Rajesh Kumar Singh, CGM, SK, BBNL | Download (415.46 KB) | 17.05.2021 |
368 | Additional charge of Director, Operation, BBNL to Shri Vijay Pratap Singh, CGM, Projects, BBNL | Download (412.04 KB) | 17.05.2021 |
367 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director, Finance, MTNL to Smt Yojanan Das, Director Finance, BSNL | Download (392.22 KB) | 12.05.2021 |
366 | Resignations of Government Nominee Directors after sale of Government stake in TCL | Download (393.35 KB) | 10.05.2021 |
365 | Extension of additional charge of the post of CMD, MTNL assigned to Shri P K Purwar | Download (387.61 KB) | 17.03.2021 |
364 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of Director Tech, MTNL to Shri Sushil Kumar Mishra | Download (379.34 KB) | 08.03.2021 |
363 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director, Finance, MTNL to Shri Suresh Kumar Gupta, Pr.CCA, Delhi | Download (385.41 KB) | 29.01.2021 |
362 | Re-appointment of Shri Sanjeev gupta, DDG PM, DoT as Govt. Nominee Director on the Board of TCIL | Download (301.69 KB) | 21.01.2021 |
361 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD, TCIL in favour of Shri Rajiv Gupta, Director Projects, TCIL | Download (361.73 KB) | 20.01.2021 |
360 | Appointment of Lt. General Milind N Bhurke, VSM, Signal Officer in-Chief, Ministry of Defence as Govt. Director | Download (331.75 KB) | 18.01.2021 |
359 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director, Finance, MTNL to Shri Suresh Kumar Gupta, Pr. CCA, Delhi | Download (394.18 KB) | 01.01.2021 |
358 | Appointment of Shri Amitabh Ranjan Sinha as Government Director on the Board of MTNL | Download (448.29 KB) | 26.11.2020 |
357 | Extension of additional charge of the post of CMD, MTNL to Shri P.K. Purwar, CMD, BSNL | Download (371.96 KB) | 23.11.2020 |
356 | Appointment of Ms. Yojana Das to the post of Director, Finance, BSNL | Download (533.2 KB) | 09.11.2020 |
355 | Appointment of Sh. Rakesh Chandra Tiwari, PGM, ITS,DoT to the post of Director, Marketing, ITI Ltd. | Download (444.65 KB) | 02.11.2020 |
354 | Appointment of Government Director on the Board of M/s Hindustan Teleprinters Ltd. | Download (51.46 KB) | 19.10.2020 |
353 | Additional charge of the post of Director, Finance, ITI Ltd. in favour of Shri Chitranjan Pradhan, IP&TAF Service | Download (375.05 KB) | 15.10.2020 |
352 | Appointment of Shri Rajeev Srivastava, GM, ITI Ltd. to the post of Director, Finance, ITI Ltd. | Download (460.09 KB) | 15.10.2020 |
351 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD, MTNL to Shri P K Purwar, CMD, BSNL | Download (392.46 KB) | 14.10.2020 |
350 | Extension of additional charge of the post of Director Planning, in favour of Shri R K Singh, CGM Skill Development, BBNL | Download (411.11 KB) | 09.10.2020 |
349 | Extension of additional charge of the post of Director Finance, in favour of Shri Vinod Kumar, CGM Finance, BBNL | Download (396.65 KB) | 09.10.2020 |
348 | Extension of additional charge of the post of Director Operations, in favour of Shri V P Singh, CGM Projects, BBNL | Download (405.29 KB) | 09.10.2020 |
347 | Retirement of Shri Milind Vijay Joshi, Director, Finance, MTNL on superannuation | Download (364.51 KB) | 30.09.2020 |
346 | Appointment of Shri Deepak Chanduka as Government Director on the Board of BBNL | Download (365.81 KB) | 28.09.2020 |
345 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director, Finance, ITI Ltd. to Shri Chitranjan Pradhan | Download (383.22 KB) | 22.09.2020 |
344 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director Planning, BBNL to Shri R.K.Singh | Download (522.92 KB) | 14.09.2020 |
343 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director, Operation, BBNL to Shri V.P. Singh | Download (524.85 KB) | 14.09.2020 |
342 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director, Finance, BBNL to Shri Vinod kumar | Download (540.61 KB) | 14.09.2020 |
341 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director, Finance, BBNL to Shri Vinod Kumar, CGM, Audit, BBNL | Download (540.61 KB) | 14.09.2020 |
340 | Extension of the Addl. Charge of Director, Marketing, ITI in favour of Sh. R.M. Agarwal, Chairman and CMD. | Download (396.25 KB) | 03.09.2020 |
339 | Minutes of the meeting of Search-cum-Selection Committee held on 18.08.2020 | Download (76.92 KB) | 18.08.2020 |
338 | Director Finance ITI - Minutes of SCSC Meeting | Download (3.67 MB) | 07.07.2020 |
337 | Director Finance BSNL - Minutes of SCSC Meeting | Download (4.04 MB) | 07.07.2020 |
336 | Extension of tenure of Sh. Rajiv Gupta as Director, Projects, TCIL | Download (341.81 KB) | 09.06.2020 |
335 | Entrustment of addl. charge of the post of Director, Operation, BBNL to Shri V P Singh, CGM, Operation, BBNL | Download (409.84 KB) | 29.05.2020 |
334 | Entrustment of addl. charge of the post of Director, Finance, BBNL to Shri Vinod Kumar, CGM, Audit, BBNL | Download (455.85 KB) | 29.05.2020 |
333 | Appointment of Shri V. Ramesh, CGM, BSNL to the post of Director Enterprise, BSNL | Download (456.13 KB) | 29.05.2020 |
332 | Entrustment of addl. charge of Director, Planning, BBNL to Shri R K Singh, CGM Skill Development, BBNL | Download (411.9 KB) | 29.05.2020 |
331 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD, TCIL | Download (375.53 KB) | 05.05.2020 |
330 | Extension of additional charge of the post of Director-Finance, BSNL. | Download (769.76 KB) | 30.04.2020 |
329 | Extension of additional charge of the post of Director-EB, BSNL to Shri Arvind Vednerkar, Director- HR, BSNL. | Download (766.34 KB) | 30.04.2020 |
328 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of Director-EB, BSNL to Shri Arvind Vednerkar, Director- HR, BSNL. | Download (373.42 KB) | 24.04.2020 |
327 | Extension of entrustment of additional charge of the post of Director-Finance, BSNL. | Download (384.67 KB) | 23.04.2020 |
326 | Corrigendum regarding Additional Charge of CMD, MTNL | Download (361.76 KB) | 15.04.2020 |
325 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD, MTNL to Shri P K Purwar, CMD, BSNL. | Download (394.3 KB) | 13.04.2020 |
324 | Appointment of Shri Nitin Jain, DDG as Govt. Director | Download (329.17 KB) | 19.03.2020 |
323 | Entrustment of add.charge of Director Finance,ITI Ltd. of Sh. Chitranjan Pradhan, IP&TAFS | Download (367.47 KB) | 18.03.2020 |