72 | Selection for the post of Dir. (Production), ITI | Download (877.77 KB) | 30.07.2015 |
71 | Apptt. of Ms. Aruna Sundararajan, AS & Admn. (USOF) as Govt. Dir. on the Board of BSNL. | Download (119.66 KB) | 29.07.2015 |
70 | Apptt. of Sh. Srikant Panda, DDG (LF-I) as Govt. Dir. on the Board of ITI. | Download (121.31 KB) | 29.07.2015 |
69 | Retirement of Shri A. N. Rai, Dir. (Ent.), BSNL | Download (114.91 KB) | 29.07.2015 |
68 | Ext. of addl. charge of Director (F), BSNL to Shri Anupam Shrivastava, CMD, BSNL for a further period of 03 months w.e.f. 01.06.2015.. | Download (124.3 KB) | 28.07.2015 |
67 | Entrustment of addl. charge of Director (Operation), BBNL to Shri B. K. Mittal, ED, MTNL w.e.f. 24.07.2015 for a period upto 31.12.2015.. | Download (107.99 KB) | 24.07.2015 |
66 | Extension of addl. charge of Director (Operation), BBNL to Shri P. K. Agarwal, Director (Planning), BBNL. | Download (142.81 KB) | 14.07.2015 |
65 | Appointment of Ms. Sumita Purkayastha, Principal, CCA Delhi as Govt. Director on the Board of TCIL. | Download (123.38 KB) | 09.07.2015 |
64 | Appointment of Ms. S. T. Ray, ED, BSNL as Director (HRD), BSNL | Download (133.53 KB) | 08.07.2015 |
63 | Ex-post facto approval of DoPT (ACC) for entrustment of addl. charge of CMD, BSNL to Shri A. N. Rai , Dir. (Enterprise), BSNL | Download (149.29 KB) | 06.07.2015 |
62 | Extension of addl. charge of Dir. (HRD), BSNL to Sh. A. N. Rai, Dir. (Enterprise), BSNL | Download (149.29 KB) | 22.06.2015 |
61 | corrigendum regarding date of occurrence of vacancy for CMD, ITI | Download (214.82 KB) | 19.06.2015 |
60 | Extension of addl. charge of Dir. (Projects), TCIL to Shri Rajesh Kapoor, Dir. (T), TCIL | Download (139.89 KB) | 19.06.2015 |
59 | Ex-post facto approval for entrustment of additional charge of the post of Director (HR), ITI in favour of Shri K. L. Dhingra, CMD, ITI from 25.02.2012 to 15.04.2014 | Download (123.51 KB) | 10.06.2015 |
58 | Appointment of Dr. Janaki Ananthakrishnan to the post of Director (Finance), ITI on deputation basis | Download (174.61 KB) | 10.06.2015 |
57 | Extension of entrustment of additional charge of the post of Director (HRD), BSNL to Shri A. N. Rai, Director (Enterprise), BSNL w.e.f. 04.06.2015 to 31.07.2015. | Download (131.15 KB) | 09.06.2015 |
56 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD, MTNL to Shri N. K. Yadav, Member (Services), Telecom Commission | Download (151.7 KB) | 08.06.2015 |
55 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD, ITI to Shri K. K. Gupta, Director (Production), ITI for a period of six months w.e.f. 01.06.2015. | Download (132.97 KB) | 04.06.2015 |
54 | Extension of tenure of Shri K. L. Dhingra as CMD, ITI from 07.04.2015 to 31.05.2015. | Download (125.71 KB) | 04.06.2015 |
53 | Appointment of Shri Rajiv Gupta, DDG, DoT as Director (Projects), TCIL | Download (132.46 KB) | 03.06.2015 |
52 | Extension of tenure of Shri K. K. Gupta as Director (Production), ITI. | Download (128.32 KB) | 03.06.2015 |
51 | Appointment of Shri N. K. Mehta as Dir. (Enterprise), BSNL | Download (135.57 KB) | 27.05.2015 |
50 | selection for the post of Dir. (Production), ITI | Download (883.62 KB) | 18.05.2015 |
49 | Ext. of addl. charge of Dir. (T) to Shri Sunil Kumar, Dir. (HR & EB), MTNL for six months beyond 30.03.2015 | Download (120.27 KB) | 14.05.2015 |
48 | selection for the post of CMD, ITI | Download (866.77 KB) | 14.05.2015 |
47 | Ent. of addl. charge of Dir. (CM), BSNL to Shri A. N. Rai, Dir. (Ent.), BSNL w.e.f. 14.05.2015 to 31.07.2015. | Download (121.18 KB) | 14.05.2015 |
46 | Apptt. of Dr. Janaki Ananthakrishnan, GM Postal Accounts & Finance Tamilnadu Circle as Govt. Dir.,ITI. | Download (117.57 KB) | 13.05.2015 |
45 | Apptt. of Smt. Simmi R. Nakra, DDG (ACs) as Govt. Dir., MTNL | Download (111.22 KB) | 13.05.2015 |
44 | Apptt. of Shri Srikant Panda, DDG (LF-I) as Govt. Dir., TCIL. | Download (111.27 KB) | 13.05.2015 |
43 | Ext. of addl. charge of Dir. (F), BSNL to Shri Anupam Shrivastav, CMD, BSNL for three months beyond 01.03.2015. | Download (119.62 KB) | 11.05.2015 |
42 | Ext. of tenure of Shr. K.L. Dhingra as CMD for a further period of 30 days beyond 07.05.2015 | Download (128.33 KB) | 07.05.2015 |
41 | Ext. of ent. of addl. charge of CMD, MTNL to Shri P. K. Purwar, Dir. (F), MTNL for a further period beyond 30.04.2015 till the approval of ACC to this Department’s proposals sent vide OM of even no. | Download (133.28 KB) | 05.05.2015 |
40 | Extension of tenure of Shri K. K. Gupta as Director (Production), ITI for a period of 30 days beyond 30.04.2015. | Download (125.26 KB) | 01.05.2015 |
39 | Ext. of entrustment of addl. charge of Dir. (Projects), TCIL to Shri Rajesh Kapoor, Dir. (T), TCIL for a further period of six months w.e.f. 01.04.2015 | Download (132.56 KB) | 17.04.2015 |
38 | ext. of entrustment of addl. charge of Dir. (T), MTNL to Shri Sunil Kumar, Dir. (HR & EB), MTNL for a further period of six months beyond 30.03.2015 | Download (128.79 KB) | 17.04.2015 |
37 | corrigendum to letter dated 12.02.2015. | Download (119.17 KB) | 08.04.2015 |
36 | Ext. of tenure of Shri K. L. Dhingra, CMD, ITI for a period of 30 days beyond 07.04.2015. | Download (116.41 KB) | 07.04.2015 |
35 | Corrigendum Regarding advertisement for the post of CMD, BBNL on deputation basis | Download (175.34 KB) | 23.03.2015 |
34 | PESB's requisition for selection to the post of Dir.(CM), BSNL. | Download (950.37 KB) | 19.03.2015 |
33 | Advt. for the post of CMD, BBNL being filled up on deputation. | Download (979.09 KB) | 14.03.2015 |
32 | Ext. of entrustment of addl. charge of CMD, MTNL to Shri P. K. Purwar, Dir. (F), MTNL till April, 2015 | Download (150.59 KB) | 10.03.2015 |
31 | Ent.of addl. charge of Dir. (F), ITI to Shri P. K. Gupta, Dir. (Production), ITI | Download (145.89 KB) | 09.03.2015 |
30 | entrustment of addl. charge of Dir. (T), MTNL to Shri Sunil Kumar, Dir. (HR & EB), MTNL for a period of 03 months beyond 30.12.2014 | Download (120.58 KB) | 19.02.2015 |
29 | Selection for the post of CMD, TCIL | Download (889.41 KB) | 12.02.2015 |
28 | Extension of entrustment of addl. charge of Dir. (O), BBNL to Shri P. K. Agarwal, Dir. (Plng) for 06 months w.e.f. 01.01.2015 | Download (131.15 KB) | 09.02.2015 |
27 | Entrustment of addl. charge of CMD, MTNL to P. K. Purwar, Dir. (F), MTNL for a period upto 28.02.2015. | Download (113.2 KB) | 27.01.2015 |
26 | Entrustment of addll. charge of Dir. (Finance) BSNL to Sh. Anupam Shrivastava, CMD, BSNL for a period w.e.f. 16.01.2015 to 28.02.2015 | Download (107.55 KB) | 22.01.2015 |
25 | Entrustment of addl. charge of Dir. (CM) BSNL to Shri N. K. Gupta, Dir.(CFA), BSNL for three months w.e.f. 16.01.2015 | Download (107.17 KB) | 22.01.2015 |
24 | Apptt. of Sh. Anupam Shrivastava, Dir (CM), BSNL as CMD, BSNL | Download (151.54 KB) | 15.01.2015 |
23 | Adherence of time schedule for submission of application to PESB for Dir. (HRD), BSNL | Download (131.05 KB) | 14.01.2015 |