122 | Extension of tenure of Sh.A K Gupta Dir (Finance), TCIL wef 01.07.2016 to 30.11.2017 | Download (51.81 KB) | 28.06.2016 |
121 | Appointment of Government Director on the Board of ITI Ltd- Sh. R M Agarwal, DDG(SU) | Download (45.09 KB) | 08.06.2016 |
120 | Entrustment of additional charge of CMD, MTNL to Shri P.K. Purwar, Director (Finance), MTNL | Download (55.96 KB) | 07.06.2016 |
119 | Entrustment of additional charge of CMD, TCIL to Shri A.K. Gupta, Director (Finance), TCIL | Download (416.16 KB) | 02.05.2016 |
118 | Entrustment of additional charge of CMD, ITI to Shri P.K. Gupta, Director (Marketing), ITI | Download (54.68 KB) | 28.04.2016 |
117 | Appointment of Government Director on the Board of MTNL- Ms. Tiakala Lynda Yaden,DDG(Accounts) | Download (140.67 KB) | 12.04.2016 |
116 | Extension of addl. charge of Dir. (Plg), BBNL to Sh. B. K. Mittal, DDG (USOF), DoT | Download (144.74 KB) | 06.04.2016 |
115 | Extension of addl. charge of Director (Operation), BBNL to Shri B. K. Mittal, DDG (USOF) | Download (147.18 KB) | 23.03.2016 |
114 | Ex-post facto regularisation of entrustment of additional charge of the post of Director (CM), BSNL to Sh. N K Mehta Dir (EN), BSN | Download (127.82 KB) | 23.03.2016 |
113 | Appointment of Government Director on the Board of MTNL- Sh. Amit Yadav, Joint Secretary (Admn.) | Download (143.14 KB) | 23.03.2016 |
112 | Entrustment of addl. charge of CMD,, BBNL to Sh. Sanjay Singh Administrator (USOF) for 03 Months w.e.f. 18.02.2016 | Download (134.88 KB) | 18.03.2016 |
111 | Extension of entrustment of Additional Charge of the Post of Director (Fin) to Sh. S T Ray Director (HRD) BSNL for 03 months w.e.f 29.02.2016 | Download (133.42 KB) | 04.03.2016 |
110 | Extension of entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD, MTNL to Shri N K Yadav, Member (S), TC w.e.f. 08.12.2015 | Download (148.74 KB) | 03.02.2016 |
109 | Order dated 01.02.2016 reg. Entrustment of additional charge of CMD, TCIL to Shri A. K. Gupta, Director (Fin), TCIL | Download (132.63 KB) | 01.02.2016 |
108 | Order dated 29.01.2016 reg. Retirement on superannuation of Sh Vimal Wakhlu, CMD, TCIL | Download (122.82 KB) | 29.01.2016 |
107 | Order dated 28.01.2016 reg. Appointment of Shri K. Alagesan as Director (Production), ITI | Download (151.78 KB) | 28.01.2016 |
106 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD, BBNL to Shri N Sivasailam, Additional Secretary (T) for six months w.e.f. 02.12.2015 | Download (127.2 KB) | 15.01.2016 |
105 | Ex-post facto approval for entrustment of additional charge of the post of Director (HR), ITI in favour of Shri K. L. Dhingra, CMD, ITI from 25.02.2012 to 15.04.2014 | Download (123.51 KB) | 14.01.2016 |
104 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director (Planning), BBNL to Shri B.K. Mittal, Director (Operation), BBNL. | Download (135.47 KB) | 31.12.2015 |
103 | Extension of entrustment of additional charge of Director (Operation), BBNL to Shri B.K. Mittal, DDG(USOF), DoT. | Download (140.79 KB) | 31.12.2015 |
102 | Appointment of Shri G. Narendra Nath, DDG (Security), DoT as Govt. Director on the Board of TCL | Download (120.38 KB) | 18.12.2015 |
101 | Confirmation of Shri P. K. Purwar as Director (Finance), MTNL | Download (121.92 KB) | 18.12.2015 |
100 | Selection for the post of Director (Technical), MTNL in schedule "A" of CPSE | Download (940.69 KB) | 17.12.2015 |
99 | ACC approval for Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD, ITI in favour of Sh. P K Gupta, Director (Mktg), ITI. | Download (129.6 KB) | 15.12.2015 |
98 | Appointment to the post of Director (Operation), BBNL on deputation through Search Cum Selection Method by DoT | Download (568.28 KB) | 14.12.2015 |
97 | Order dated 11.12.2015 regarding relinquishment of charge by Sh. P K Agarwal, Director (Planning), BBNL | Download (130.03 KB) | 11.12.2015 |
96 | Order dated 09.12.2015 regarding relinquish of charge from Board of BBNL | Download (125.31 KB) | 09.12.2015 |
95 | Order dated 09.12.2015 regarding Extension of Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD, MTNL | Download (139.94 KB) | 09.12.2015 |
94 | Ex-post facto regularisation of entrustment of additional charge of the post of Director (Operation), BBNL in favour of Shri P. K Agarwal, Director (Planning), BBNL | Download (117.21 KB) | 03.12.2015 |
93 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD, BBNL | Download (134.09 KB) | 02.12.2015 |
92 | Entrustment of addl. charge of the post of CMD, ITI to Shri P. K. Gupta, Director (Marketing), ITI beyond 31.10.2015 - corrigendum | Download (113.1 KB) | 27.11.2015 |
91 | Appointment of Shri Saday Krishna Kanoria as NoD on the Board of ITI | Download (143.58 KB) | 24.11.2015 |
90 | Appointment of Shri Ashok Mittal and Shri Rakesh Nangia as NoD on the Board of MTNL | Download (165.28 KB) | 23.11.2015 |
89 | Appointment of Prof. (Smt.) Rekha Jain, IIM Ahmedabad as NoD on the Board of TCIL | Download (146.34 KB) | 23.11.2015 |
88 | Extension of entrustment of additional charge of Director (T), MTNL to Shri Sunil Kumar, Dir. (HR&EB), MTNL | Download (137.27 KB) | 06.11.2015 |
87 | Appointment of Shri Shashi Ranjan Kumar, JS (A) as Govt. Director on the Board of BBNL and MTNL | Download (134.95 KB) | 06.11.2015 |
86 | Entrustment of addl. charge of the post of CMD, ITI to Shri P. K. Gupta, Director (Marketing), ITI for a period of six months beyond 31.10.2015 | Download (142.3 KB) | 03.11.2015 |
85 | Appointment of Shri R. K. Mittal, GM, MTNL as Director (CM), BSNL from the date of assumption of the charge | Download (162.47 KB) | 03.11.2015 |
84 | Entrustment of addl. charge of the post of Director (Production), ITI to Shri S. Gopu, Director (HR), ITI for a period of three months beyond 31.10.2015 | Download (127.2 KB) | 29.10.2015 |
83 | Retirement of Shri K. K. Gupta, Director (Production) and addl. charge of CMD, ITI on superannuation on 31.10.2015 | Download (128.05 KB) | 29.10.2015 |
82 | Appointment of Shri N. Sivasailam, Addl. Secretary (T), DoT as Govt. Director on the Board of BSNL. | Download (125.27 KB) | 21.10.2015 |
81 | Extension of entrustment of additional charge of Director (Finance), BSNL to Ms. S. T. Ray, Director (HRD), BSNL w.e.f. 21.10.2015 to 29.02.2016 | Download (123.17 KB) | 21.10.2015 |
80 | Ex-post facto regularization of addl. charge of the post of CMD, BBNL in favour of Ms. Aruna Sundararajan, Administrator (USOF) for the period from 01.10.2014 to 31.01.2016 or until regular incumbent is appointed or until further orders, whichever is earl | Download (131.1 KB) | 19.10.2015 |
79 | Ex-post facto regularization of addl. charge of the post of Director (CM), BSNL to Shri A. N. Rai, then Director (Enterprise), BSNL | Download (137.78 KB) | 05.10.2015 |
78 | Extension of addl. charge of Director (CM), BSNL to Shri N. K. Mehta, Director (Enterprise), BSNL for a period of 03 months w.e.f. 01.08.2015 | Download (122.24 KB) | 01.10.2015 |
77 | Confirmation of Shri Sunil Kumar as Director (HR&EB),MTNL for the balance period of his tenure after expiry of 1st year on 20.06.2014 subject to decision of court case [WP(C)1484/2014–Fight for Right Vs.PESB&Ors.] pending before Hon’ble HighCourt of Delhi | Download (137.57 KB) | 30.09.2015 |
76 | Appointment of Smt. Padma Iyer Kaul, DDG (LFA), DoT as Govt. Director on the Board of Bharat Sanchar Nigam Limited (BSNL) | Download (126.43 KB) | 18.09.2015 |
75 | Appointment of Shri R. M. Agarwal, DDG (SU), DoT as Govt. Director on the Board of Millenium Telecom Limited (MTL) | Download (120.19 KB) | 18.09.2015 |
74 | Ex-post facto regul. of exten. in tenure of Sh. K. L. Dhingra as CMD, ITI | Download (131.08 KB) | 18.08.2015 |
73 | Ent. of addl. charge of Dir. (CM), BSNL to Shri N. K. Mehta, Dir. (Enterprise), BSNL for a period of two months w.e.f. 01.08.2015 | Download (117.05 KB) | 03.08.2015 |