172 | Selection for the post of Director(Finance), MTNL | Download (2.56 MB) | 28.08.2017 |
171 | Selection for the post of Director (Technical), TCIL, in Schedule 'A' of the CPSE | Download (2.42 MB) | 25.08.2017 |
170 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of Director(Fin.), BBNL for 3 months beyond 27.07.2017 | Download (392.35 KB) | 23.08.2017 |
169 | Entrustment of additional charge of CMD, BBNL to Sh. Sanjay Singh, Additional Secretary & Administrator (USOF), DoT for 03 months beyond 31/07/2017 | Download (381.76 KB) | 23.08.2017 |
168 | Selection for the post of Director (Finance), TCIL in Schedule 'A' of CPSE | Download (2.53 MB) | 21.08.2017 |
167 | Selection for the post of Director (Marketing), ITI Ltd. a Schedule 'A' CPSE | Download (2.63 MB) | 21.08.2017 |
166 | Appointment of Sh A. Seshagiri Rao, Dir (NP&M), RCIL, to the post of CMD TCIL | Download (458.5 KB) | 21.08.2017 |
165 | Selection for the post of Director (CFA), BSNL | Download (2.59 MB) | 11.08.2017 |
164 | Continuance of Sh. B.K.Mittal to hold Additional Charge of Director(Operation),BBNL & Director(Planning),BBNL entrusted with approval of ACC-Orders reg. | Download (424.37 KB) | 21.07.2017 |
163 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD, ITI to Sh. S. Gopu, Director(HR), ITI for nine months wef 01.01.17 | Download (374.31 KB) | 13.07.2017 |
162 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD,ITI to Sh. S. Gopu, Director(HR) for 03 months beyond 30/06/2017 | Download (366.69 KB) | 30.06.2017 |
161 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of Director(Mktg.), ITI, to Sh. K. Alagesan, Director(Production), ITI for 03 months beyond 30/06/2017 | Download (391.04 KB) | 30.06.2017 |
160 | Order regarding tenure end of appointment of Sh. N.K.Gupta as Director(CFA), BSNL | Download (380.68 KB) | 21.06.2017 |
159 | Extension of Additional Charge of the post of Director(Mktg.), ITI, to Sh. K. Algaesan, Dir (Prod) ,ITI for 03 months w.e.f. 01.04.17 | Download (361.03 KB) | 14.06.2017 |
158 | Extension of Additional charge of the post of CMD, TCIL to Sh. A. K. Gupta, Dir (Fin.), TCIL, for six months w.e.f. 01.05.2017 | Download (387.79 KB) | 14.06.2017 |
157 | End of Tenure of Sh. N.K.Gupta as Dir(CFA), BSNL | Download (390.43 KB) | 30.05.2017 |
156 | Entrustment of additional charge of Dir(CFA), BSNL to Sh. N.K. Mehta, Dir(Enterprise), BSNL | Download (393.52 KB) | 30.05.2017 |
155 | Entrustment of Additional Charge of the post of CMD, ITI to Sh. S. Gopu, Dir (HR), ITI for 3 months wef 01/04/2017 | Download (356.07 KB) | 22.05.2017 |
154 | Entrustment of Additional charge of the post of Director( Mktg.),ITI to Sh. K Alagesan, Director (Production), ITI, for 3 months wef 01/04/2017 | Download (366.36 KB) | 22.05.2017 |
153 | Extension of entrustment of Additional Charge of the post of CMD, BBNL to Sh. Sanjay Singh, JS & Administrator (USOF) | Download (381.03 KB) | 01.05.2017 |
152 | Assignment of additional charge of the post of Dir(Planning) BBNL to Sh. B K Mittal, Sr. DDG(USOF), DoT for six months wef 23.03.2017 | Download (391.38 KB) | 24.04.2017 |
151 | Extension of additional charge of the post of Director(finance), BSNL to Sh. S.T.Ray, Director(HRD), BSNL for six months wef 01.03.2017 | Download (396.53 KB) | 06.04.2017 |
150 | Extension of entrustment of Additional Charge of the post of Director (Planning), BBNL to Sh. B.K.Mittal | Download (422.62 KB) | 30.03.2017 |
149 | Entrustment of Additional charge of Director( Finance), MTNL to Sh. P K Purwar, CMD, MTNL for three months w.e.f. 03.03.2017 | Download (344.73 KB) | 30.03.2017 |
148 | Extension of entrustment of additional charge of Director(finance), BSNL to Sh. S.T.Ray, Director(HRD), BSNL for 03 months beyond 28.02.2017 | Download (392.39 KB) | 15.03.2017 |
147 | Extension of Additional Charge of the post of Director(Operation), BBNL to Sh. B.K.Mittal, Sr. DDG(USOF),DoT till the date of his superannuation i.e. 31/10/2017 | Download (373.37 KB) | 03.03.2017 |
146 | Appointment of Sh. P.K.Purwar, Director(Finance),MTNL to the post of CMD,MTNL | Download (416.87 KB) | 02.03.2017 |
145 | Additional Charge of the Post of Director(Finance), BBNL | Download (422.74 KB) | 17.02.2017 |
144 | Extension of Entrustment of additional charge of Director(Finance), BBNL to Shri Manoj Anand(DDG), for three months beyond 27.01.2017 | Download (443.01 KB) | 31.01.2017 |
143 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director(Operation), BBNL to Shri B K Mittal, Sr DDG(USOF) DoT, for three months beyond 31.12.2016 | Download (408.16 KB) | 31.01.2017 |
142 | Appointment of Non Official Government Director on the Board of ITI | Download (2.18 MB) | 30.01.2017 |
141 | Appointment of Non Official Government Director on the Board of BSNL | Download (2.33 MB) | 30.01.2017 |
140 | Comments on draft Job Description of the Post of Director (HR) and Director (Finance) | Download (4.73 MB) | 18.01.2017 |
139 | Extension of entrustment of Additional charge of Dir(Finance), BSNL to Sh. S T Ray Dir(HRD) for six months beyond 01.09.2016 | Download (42.94 KB) | 16.12.2016 |
138 | Entrustment of additional charge of Dir(Finance), BBNL to Shri Manoj Anand DDG, DoT for six months from 28.07.2016 | Download (42.31 KB) | 16.12.2016 |
137 | Appointment of Government Director on the Board of TCL, BBNL, HTL & HCL order of appointment | Download (1.58 MB) | 16.12.2016 |
136 | Entrustment of additional charge of CMD, MTNL to Shri P.K. Purwar, Director (Finance), MTNL for three months beyond 07.09.2016 | Download (50.74 KB) | 18.11.2016 |
135 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director(Finance), BBNL to Sh. Manoj Anand, DDG(DoT) | Download (419.84 KB) | 07.11.2016 |
134 | Looking after charge of the post of Member(S) | Download (290.67 KB) | 04.10.2016 |
133 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD, BBNL to Sh. Sanjay Singh JS & Admin(USOF), DoT for Six months w.e.f 18.03.2016 | Download (2 MB) | 23.09.2016 |
132 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director(Operation), BBNL to DDG(USOF), DoT for six months w.e.f. 01.07.2016 | Download (2.12 MB) | 23.09.2016 |
131 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director(Planning), BBNL to Sh. B K Mittal, DDG(USOF), DoT for three months beyond 22.09.2016 | Download (2.03 MB) | 22.09.2016 |
130 | Extension of entrustment of Additional charge of CMD, BBNL to Sh. Sanjay Singh Admin (USOF) for three months beyond 17.09.2016 | Download (2.01 MB) | 16.09.2016 |
129 | Extension of entrustment of Additional charge of Director (Finance), BSNL to Sh. S T Ray Director (HRD), BSNL for three months beyond 31.08.2016 | Download (2.07 MB) | 15.09.2016 |
128 | Entrustment of additional charge of CMD, MTNL to Director (Fin) MTNL | Download (2.12 MB) | 09.08.2016 |
127 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director(Fin) BBNL to DDG, DoT | Download (2.25 MB) | 28.07.2016 |
126 | Order reg Ending of tenure of Smt Arundhati Panda as interim Director (Finance) in BBNL PDF | Download (44.05 KB) | 25.07.2016 |
125 | Entrustment of additional charge of Director(Operation), BBNL to DDG(USOF), DoT | Download (58.9 KB) | 01.07.2016 |
124 | Appointment of Sh. Sanjeev Kumar as Director (Technical), MTNL | Download (69.19 KB) | 28.06.2016 |
123 | Entrustment of additional charge of CMD, BBNL to Sh. Sanjay Singh, Administrator (USOF), DoT | Download (51.37 KB) | 28.06.2016 |