222 | Order dated 17.07.2018 regarding Appointment of Five Persons as NoDs on the board of ITI Ltd | Download (828.69 KB) | 17.07.2018 |
221 | Retirement of Shri R. K. Mittal, Director (CM) BSNL on superannuation | Download (1.12 MB) | 29.06.2018 |
220 | Entrustment of addl. charge of Dir (CM), BSNL to CMD, BSNL w.e.f. 01.07.2018 | Download (1.04 MB) | 29.06.2018 |
219 | Extension of addl.charge assigned to Sh. A.S. Rao, CMD TCIL for six months | Download (1.04 MB) | 15.06.2018 |
218 | Retirement Notification of Sh S. Gopu, CMD, ITI | Download (392.5 KB) | 31.05.2018 |
217 | Entrustment of additional charge of post of CMD, ITI to Sh. K. Alagesan, Dir (Prod.), ITI | Download (441.57 KB) | 31.05.2018 |
216 | Additional Charge of the Post of Director (Finance), MTNL | Download (409.57 KB) | 30.05.2018 |
215 | Extension of tenure of appointment of Sh Sunil Kumar, Director(HR&EB), MTNL | Download (431.38 KB) | 16.05.2018 |
214 | Selection for the post of Director (HR), BSNL | Download (2.67 MB) | 15.05.2018 |
213 | Additional Charge of the post of Director (Technical), TCIL | Download (462.28 KB) | 15.05.2018 |
212 | Confirmation of Sh P K Purwar as CMD, MTNL-Orders reg. | Download (374.48 KB) | 15.05.2018 |
211 | Selection for the post of Director(Enterprise), BSNL | Download (2.6 MB) | 10.05.2018 |
210 | Additional Charge of the Post of Director (Finance), BBNL | Download (397.02 KB) | 03.05.2018 |
209 | Additional Charge of the Post of Director (Operations), BBNL | Download (397.01 KB) | 03.05.2018 |
208 | Selection for the post of Dir(Fin), ITI Ltd. | Download (2.61 MB) | 02.05.2018 |
207 | Selection for the post of Dir(Fin), BSNL | Download (2.66 MB) | 02.05.2018 |
206 | Additional Charge of the post of Director(Mktg.), ITI | Download (416.8 KB) | 02.05.2018 |
205 | Selection for the Post of Director (Fin), MTNL | Download (2.53 MB) | 28.03.2018 |
204 | Extension of the additional charge of the post of Director(Fin.) TCIL to Sh. Rajiv Gupta, Director(Project) TCIL | Download (442.23 KB) | 28.03.2018 |
203 | Selection for the post of Director (HR), ITI Ltd | Download (2.63 MB) | 14.03.2018 |
202 | Extension of additional charge of the post of Dir (CFA), BSNL assigned to Sh N K Mehta, Dir (Enterprise), BSNL for 6 months wef 01.03.2018 | Download (390.21 KB) | 27.02.2018 |
201 | Extension of additional charge of the post of Dir (Fin), BSNL assigned to Ms S T Ray , Dir (HRD), BSNL for 6 months wef 01.03.2018 | Download (409.58 KB) | 27.02.2018 |
200 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of Director(HR), ITI to Sh. S Gopu, CMD, ITI for three months wef 23.01.2018 | Download (386.13 KB) | 16.02.2018 |
199 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of Director(Operations), BBNL to Sh. N. K. Joshi , DDG (USOF) for three months beyond 14.02.2018 | Download (431.05 KB) | 16.02.2018 |
198 | Order regarding appointment of Sh Amit Yadav, JS(T) as Goverenment Director on the board of BBNL | Download (355.65 KB) | 01.02.2018 |
197 | Order regarding appointment of Sh Amit Yadav, JS(T) as Goverenment Director on the Board of BSNL | Download (353.76 KB) | 01.02.2018 |
196 | Order regarding appointment of Sh Sanjeev Gupta, DDG(PM),DoT as Goverenment Director on the Board of TCIL | Download (366.57 KB) | 01.02.2018 |
195 | Order regarding Appointment of Sh. S Gopu, Dir (HR), ITI as CMD, ITI | Download (551.02 KB) | 23.01.2018 |
194 | Entrustment of Additional charge of the post of CMd, ITI, to Sh S Gopu , Director(HR), ITI for three months beyond 30.12.2017 | Download (356.03 KB) | 04.01.2018 |
193 | Extension of additional charge of the post of Director(Mktg.), ITI to Sh.k. Alagesan, Director (Prod.), ITI for 3 months wef 01.01.2018 | Download (373.69 KB) | 28.12.2017 |
192 | Orders regarding Ex-post -facto regularization of additional charge of the post of Director(Planning), BBNL held by Sh. B.K.Mittal, Advisor, DoT, from 23.09.2017 to 31.10.2017 | Download (386.37 KB) | 26.12.2017 |
191 | Orders regarding premature termination of deputation tenure of Dr. Janaki Ananthakrishana, Dir (Fin), ITI Ltd. | Download (375.1 KB) | 11.12.2017 |
190 | Orders regarding assigning charge of the post of Dir (Fin), ITI Ltd. to Sh. Chitraranjan Pradhan for a period of Six months. | Download (411.85 KB) | 11.12.2017 |
189 | Selection for the post of Director(CM), BSNL | Download (3.77 MB) | 30.11.2017 |
188 | Retirement Order dtd 30/11/2017 of Sh. A.K.Gupta, Dir(Finance), TCIL | Download (360.3 KB) | 30.11.2017 |
187 | Assignment of additional charge of Dir (Finance), MTNL to Sh. P.K.Purwar, CMD MTNLfor six months | Download (359.51 KB) | 30.11.2017 |
186 | Entrustment of additional charge of Dir (Finance), TCIL to Sh Rajiv Gupta, Dir(Projects), TCIL for 3 months. | Download (416.12 KB) | 30.11.2017 |
185 | Selection for the post of Director(Finance) in MTNL | Download (2.39 MB) | 24.11.2017 |
184 | Entrustment of additonal charge of the post of Director (Operation), BBNL to Sh. N.K.Joshi, DDG(USOF), DoT | Download (379.2 KB) | 15.11.2017 |
183 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of Director (Planning), BBNL to Sh. A. K. Saxena, CGM, BSNL & State Head, Maharashtra | Download (419.72 KB) | 15.11.2017 |
182 | Entrustment of additional charge of CMD, BBNL to Sh. Sanjay Singh, Additional Secretary & Administrator (USOF), DoT . | Download (389.23 KB) | 31.10.2017 |
181 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of Dir (Planning) to Sh. B. K.Mittal, Advisor, DoT beyond 22.09.17 till 31.10.2017. | Download (399.26 KB) | 24.10.2017 |
180 | Order regarding Approval of ACC for additional charge of the post of Dir (Finance), , BBNL to Sh. Manoj Anand, CGM (Fin), BBNL | Download (409.45 KB) | 10.10.2017 |
179 | Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CMD,ITI to Sh. S. Gopu, Director(HR) for 03 months beyond 30.09.2017 | Download (373.29 KB) | 28.09.2017 |
178 | Extension of Tenure of Sh Rajesh Kapoor, Director( Tech), TCIL, wef 30.08.17 (A/N) till 31.01.2018 | Download (419.77 KB) | 25.09.2017 |
177 | Order reg appointment of Four Non official Independent Directors on the board of MTNL. | Download (648.28 KB) | 08.09.2017 |
176 | Order reg appointment of Two Non official Independent Directors on the board of BSNL | Download (467.18 KB) | 08.09.2017 |
175 | Orders regarding extension of tenure of Sh. Rajesh Kapoor as Dir (Technical), TCIL for one more month beyond 30.08.2017 | Download (434.28 KB) | 06.09.2017 |
174 | Extension of additional charge of the post of Director (Mktg.), ITI, in favour of Sh. K. Alagesan, Director (Prod.), ITI. for six months wef 01.07.2017 | Download (374.25 KB) | 05.09.2017 |
173 | Orders regarding assignment of additional charge of Dir (CFA), BSNL to Sh. N.K.Mehta, Dir (Enterprise), BSNL, for six months wef 01.09.2017 | Download (366.33 KB) | 31.08.2017 |